judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CRUM, JOHN H. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1070
Short Caption:CRUM, JOHN H. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F3611-81Filed Date:08/09/1982

Opening Event Date:08/09/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/01/1982Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/21/1983
Argued/Submitted:07/07/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901CRUM, JOHN H. UNITED STATES
08/09/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/01/1982FiledRecord Completed
04/21/1983FiledBriefing Completed
07/07/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/15/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition