judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00072-CV
09-81-00072-CV
12/17/1981
Other Personal Injury
Trinity River Authority, et al
Williams, Carla Leigh, et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/20/1985Case stored
07/18/1984Petition for WritMotion or Writ Granted
10/31/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/31/1983Writ Filed
09/29/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/23/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/22/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/08/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/17/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
09/08/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
08/19/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
06/15/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
05/14/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
04/19/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Brief Filed
01/12/1982Statement of Facts Filed
12/17/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/20/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Jack R. King
8733