Case: 00-1259
00-1259
12/06/2000
Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review pursuant to Tex. R. App. P. 53.7(f)
BETTY BAKER
GREGG COUNTY, TEXAS and MOLLY BARBER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/15/2001 | Case Stored | G02/20-C-2 | | |
04/06/2001 | Case Stored | G02/19-F-4 | | |
02/08/2001 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Filing granted | motion to dismiss appeal is granted. | |
02/07/2001 | Motion to dismiss application for writ of error | On behalf of Betty Baker | | |
01/08/2001 | Notice received | Letter to advise the court that an appeal will no longer be pursed. | | |
01/08/2001 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | Informed petitioner needs to file motion to dismiss | | |
12/07/2000 | Certification (various) in case received | certificate of conference for 53.7(f) motion; rec'd via fax (O+2) | | |
12/07/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | m/e/t to file petition for review is granted; petition is due 1-8-01 | |
12/07/2000 | Petition due | petition for review is due January 8, 2001. | | |
12/06/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | on behalf of Betty Baker | | |
12/06/2000 | Notice requesting filing fee | $10 for 53.7(f) motion letter sent to Jon Ker | | |
12/06/2000 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | requested certificate of conference & fee | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/15/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/20-C-2 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
BAKER, BETTY | Petitioner | Mr. Jon R. Ker |
GREGG COUNTY, TEXAS | Respondent | Mr. Robert S. Davis |
BARBER, MOLLY | Respondent | Mr. Robert S. Davis |
Court of Appeals Information:
06-99-00172-CV
33 SW3d 72, 10-23-00
6th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information