judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00263-CR
04-81-00263-CR
12/16/1981
Assault or Attempted Murder
Alexander, Oris
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/07/1992Case Returned from Higher Court
11/21/1991Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/28/1982Mandate Issued
10/28/1982Mandate Issued
10/27/1982Case Returned from Higher Court
10/18/1982Higher Court DecisionRefused
10/13/1982Case Forwarded to Higher Court
10/08/1982Petition for Review Filed
09/03/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/29/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/14/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/12/1982Submission
05/12/1982Submission
05/12/1982Submitted
02/11/1982Case ready to be set
02/11/1982Brief Filed
02/11/1982Case ready to be set
01/13/1982Brief Filed
12/16/1981Record Filed
12/16/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/11/1981Notice of appeal received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
10/28/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
81-CR-1784
Life