Case: 05-00-00873-CV
05-00-00873-CV
06/02/2000
Miscellaneous civil
Cullen Plumbing, Inc. d/b/a Cullen Pools, Inc., and Greg Cullen d/b/a Cullen Pools, Inc.
Duncan, Mark and Duncan, Teresa
No
13th Court of Appeals
06/21/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
07/04/2000 | Record due | | |
06/21/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/21/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted | |
06/02/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/02/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | | |
06/02/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
06/02/2000 | 125.00 Filing Fee Paid | | |
06/02/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |
06/02/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
05/05/2000 | Motion for New Trial Filed | | |
03/06/2000 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/21/2000 | Case Stored | Case archived |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Cullen Plumbing, Inc. D/b/a Cu | Appellant | Peter T. Martin |
Mark And Teresa Duncan | Appellee | David William Bower |
Mary Ann Lee | Court Reporter - Trial Court | Rockwall Court Reporter, 382nd District Court |
Trial Court Information
382nd Judicial District Court
Rockwall
Honorable Sue M. Pirtle
1-99-461