Case: 05-90-00578-CV
05-90-00578-CV
05/21/1990
Contract
M.J.R. Corporation & Western Lloyds Insurance Company
Scottsdale Insurance Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/09/2016 | Order entered | Destroy | | ||
03/30/2016 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||
07/06/2001 | Record Retention | Destroy | | ||
03/06/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |||
03/06/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |||
01/09/1991 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
01/09/1991 | Opinion issued | Otherwise Disposed | | ||
12/12/1990 | Mot Ext Time File Strans Disp | Motion or Writ Denied | | ||
12/11/1990 | Submission | | |||
12/11/1990 | Submitted | | |||
12/11/1990 | Submission | | |||
12/11/1990 | Submitted | | |||
12/10/1990 | Mot Ext Time File Strans | | |||
10/26/1990 | Letter Filed | | |||
10/24/1990 | MattConv | | |||
07/13/1990 | Brief Filed | | |||
07/13/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |||
07/13/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |||
06/20/1990 | Brief Filed | | |||
06/20/1990 | MattConv | | |||
05/21/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |||
05/21/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |||
05/03/1990 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |||
02/02/1990 | Judgment Entered by the Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/09/2016 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
No Party. |
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
88-6358-D