judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Elvestur Baptiest, Sears Roebuck & Co., & Sears Termite & Pe v. Judge Bill Rhea, 162nd District Court, Dallas County, Texas

Case: 05-90-00569-CV
05-90-00569-CV
05/21/1990
Mandamus
Elvestur Baptiest, Sears Roebuck & Co., & Sears Termite & Pe
Judge Bill Rhea, 162nd District Court, Dallas County, Texas
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
01/23/2002Order EnteredDestroy
08/22/2001Record RetentionDestroy
06/04/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
06/04/1990Response to Motion
06/04/1990Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/25/1990Exhibits Filed
05/21/1990MattConv
05/21/1990Motion for Leave to File
05/21/1990Order Entered
05/21/1990Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/23/2002Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
162nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Bill Rhea
90-318-I