Case: 06-90-00053-CV
06-90-00053-CV
09/27/1990
Miscellaneous civil
Texas Farmers Insurance Company
Edward M. Garza, Nancy Donald, Dustin Blair & Valerie Kirby
No
3rd Court of Appeals
09/27/1990
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
09/25/2000 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
08/22/1991 | Mandate Issued | | |
04/16/1991 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
04/16/1991 | Opinion issued | Dismissed | |
04/11/1991 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
09/27/1990 | | ||
09/27/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |
09/27/1990 | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/22/1991 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Nancy Donald, Individually | Appellee | Hon. Timothy M. Sulak |
Travelers Ins. Co. | Attorney for Intervenor | Hon. Carl Kolb |
Texas Farmers Ins. Co. | Appellant | Hon. Tom Tourtellotte |
Nancy Donald, anf Dustin Blair | Appellee | Hon. Edward Berliner |
Edward M. Garza | Appellee | Hon. Gary L. Kilgore |
Valerie Kirby | Appellee | Hon. Terry Weldon |
Trial Court Information
126th District Court
Travis
Honorable Joseph Hill Hart
467,212