judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LOPEZ VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34670
Short Caption:LOPEZ VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35730
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D225349Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:12/21/1999How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Delanoy English Schuetze & McGaha, P.C.--check no. 4367.
08/16/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition and Requst for Stay of Proceedings below during the Pendency of this Writ and Certificate of Mailing. 99-07589
08/16/1999Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition and Requst for Stay of Proceedings below during the Pendency of this Writ. 99-07590
09/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[We elect to construe petitioner's request for a writ of prohibition as a motion for a stay of the district court proceedings pending our resolution of this petition. We grant the motion and temporarily stay all proceedings below pending our futher consideration of this petition and any answer thereto]. 99-08749
10/06/1999Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No.1271returned to Douglas J. Gardner with letter. No filing fee required with response.
10/06/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Argument Directed at Issues of Arguable Cause Against the Issuance of Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition, Request to Lift the Stay Placed on the Nevada District Court Proceedings and Certificate of Mailing 99-09578
10/14/1999MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioner's Request for Leave of Court to File Reply to Real Party in Interest's Opposition to Petition for Writs of Mandamus/Prohibition and Request for Stay of Proceedings Below. 99-09965
11/18/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a reply. 99-11483
12/03/1999MotionFiled Reply to Response. Petitioner's Reply Brief. 99-12107
12/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the papers filed herein. 99-13013
12/21/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Submitted on the papers to the Southern Nevada Panel this day.
12/23/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Judgment: "we deny this petition." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB. 99-13070
01/18/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-00665
01/18/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.