judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LARRY DEAN SINNING, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0081)
Case Number:S-07-0081Case Docketed On:04/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:LARRY DEAN SINNING, JR. v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:LARRY DEAN SINNING, JR., Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantLarry Dean Sinning Jr.Diane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 193
Citation:172 P.3d 388 (Wyo. 2007)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/29/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/30/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/21/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
07/16/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
07/18/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/24/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/01/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Pre-Sentence Investigation; Volume III, TranscriptsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/01/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
08/06/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
12/11/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affimring. Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/27/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/27/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/27/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/02/2008Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal