judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PERKINS, NELDA A. HSG

Case Information: 80-CV-1001
Short Caption:PERKINS, NELDA A. HSGClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA14997-79Filed Date:08/08/1980

Opening Event Date:08/08/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/16/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/21/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/01/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901PERKINS, NELDA A. HSG ET AL
08/08/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/16/1981FiledRecord Completed
10/21/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/01/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition