Case: 03-90-00222-CV
03-90-00222-CV
09/24/1990
Contract
Robert W. Dillard, Donald R. Dillard & Dillard Graphics, Inc.
NCNB Texas National Bank
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/20/2002 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |||
01/10/1992 | Mandate Issued | | |||
08/30/1991 | Opinion issued | Reversed and Remanded |
| ||
05/08/1991 | Submitted | | |||
05/08/1991 | Submission | | |||
05/02/1991 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |||
04/05/1991 | Submission | | |||
11/28/1990 | Mt file Supp Record Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||
11/28/1990 | Supplemental Transcript filed | | |||
11/19/1990 | Brief filed | | |||
11/19/1990 | Case ready to be set | | |||
11/19/1990 | Mt file Supplemental Record Filed | | |||
10/24/1990 | Brief filed | | |||
09/24/1990 | Transcript Filed | | |||
09/24/1990 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/10/1992 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Ncnb Texas National Bank | Appellee | Mr. Dennis Reese |
Dillard Graphics, Inc. | Appellant | Mr. Nicolai Von Kreisler |
Donald R. Dillard | Appellant | Mr. Nicolai Von Kreisler |
Robert W. Dillard | Appellant | Mr. Nicolai Von Kreisler |
Trial Court Information
98th District Court
Travis
Honorable Edward L. Jarrett
451,284