judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00307-CV
08-81-00307-CV
12/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Vasquez, Samuel
Vasquez, Norma
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/05/1984Shuck purged
07/12/1983Mandate Issued
06/01/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
03/21/1983No description available.
03/09/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/04/1983No description available.
03/04/1983No description available.
02/18/1983No description available.
02/02/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/20/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/05/1983Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1982No description available.
12/15/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Rendered
09/10/1982Submitted
07/28/1982Submission
02/16/1982Brief Filed
01/20/1982Brief Filed
01/06/1982Motion for Ext Transcript DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/1981Motion - Extension to File Transcript filed
12/21/1981Transcript Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
168th District Court
El Paso
80-4913