Case Heading (S-17-0029) | |||||
Case Number: | S-17-0029 | Case Docketed On: | 01/26/2017 | ||
Linked To: | S-17-0030 | ||||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | First Judicial District Laramie County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2) | ||
Short Title: | HIGH PLAINS ENTERPRISES, LLC v. THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY R. GLOVER, Deceased: JOHN E. MASTERS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley R. Glover and UNIFIED PEOPLE'S FEDERAL CREDIT UNION | ||||
Full Title: | HIGH PLAINS ENTERPRISES, LLC, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. THE ESTATE OF SHIRLEY R. GLOVER, Deceased: JOHN E. MASTERS, as Personal Representative of the Estate of Shirley R. Glover, Appellee (Plaintiff) and UNIFIED PEOPLE'S FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, Appellee (Defendant). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | High Plains Enterprises, LLC | Bruce S. Asay |
Appellee | Unified People's Federal Credit Union | Thomas M. Hogan |
Appellee | The Estate of Shirley R. Glover, Deceased: John E. Masters | Christopher Michael Brennan Matthew H. Romsa |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
01/26/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
01/26/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
01/26/2017 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
01/26/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
01/31/2017 | Event - Phone Call received from attorney Chris Brennan requesting that caption be changed. | Event | Phone Call | Final | |
02/01/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Amendment to Case Caption | Notice-Outgoing | Other | Final | |
02/07/2017 | Order Dismissing Appeals | Order | Dismiss - jurisdiction | Final | |
02/21/2017 | Motion - Fees and costs | Motion | Fees and costs | Final | |
02/22/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee the Estate of Shirley R. Glover's Motion for Fees and Costs | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
02/28/2017 | Response/Objection - Motion | Response/Objection | Motion | Final | |
02/28/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant, High Plains Enterprises, LLC's, Traverse to Appellee, The Estate of Shirley R. Glover's, Motion to Fees and Costs | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
03/07/2017 | Order Denying Motion for Fees and Costs | Order | Deny | Final | |
03/07/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |