judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SMITH, NORMAN A. EXECUTIVE CLUB LTD

Case Information: 80-CV-0758
Short Caption:SMITH, NORMAN A. EXECUTIVE CLUB LTDClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA1695-77Filed Date:06/13/1980

Opening Event Date:06/13/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/07/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/18/1982
Argued/Submitted:04/01/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SMITH, NORMAN A. EXECUTIVE CLUB LTD ET AL
06/13/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/07/1981FiledRecord Completed
02/18/1982FiledBriefing Completed
04/01/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/16/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition