judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JENKINS VS. JENKINS

Case Information: 34669
Short Caption:JENKINS VS. JENKINSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D227247Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/24/1999 / Marks, DanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from George R. Carter--check no. 1297.
08/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07581
08/24/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Daniel Marks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/20/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 10, 1999. 99-10227
12/27/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Change of Address. 99-13169
01/18/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-00772
02/09/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We defer ruling on the stipulation to dismiss. Appellant shall, within 60 days from the date of this order, file in this court a copy of an order from the district court certifying that it is inclined to grant the relief request by the parties or in the event the district court declines to provide the appropriate certification, the parties shall so inform this court. 00-02027
04/10/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Order Certifying Settlement Negotiations Pursuant to Huney Cutt v. Huney Cutt, 94 Nev. 79, 575 P.2d 585 (1978). 00-05666
04/19/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. We approve the parties' stipulation. " . . . we remand this matter to the district court pursuant to its certification, and we dismiss this appeal, the parties to bear their own costs and attorney's fees." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-06273
04/19/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.