judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MICHAEL DALE ISELI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (06-181)
Case Number:06-181Case Docketed On:08/08/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:MICHAEL DALE ISELI v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MICHAEL DALE ISELI, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMichael Dale IseliD. Terry Rogers
Donna D. Domonkos
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
James Michael Causey

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/08/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/08/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/08/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/22/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/22/2006Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
11/13/2006Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
11/13/2006Petition - Reinstatement of appealPetitionReinstatementFinal
11/13/2006Memorandum - In support of petition for reinstatementMemorandumIn support of petitionFinal
11/22/2006Order - Reinstatement of appealOrderReinstatementFinal
12/27/2006Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/28/2006Order - Grant - extension of time brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/29/2007Brief - Appellant; and received copy on disk; received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppellantFinal
03/14/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appealBriefAppelleeFinal
04/02/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/04/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes: Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts; Volume III, confidential documentsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, WestlingNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - James Michael CauseyNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; James Michael Causey, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/15/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/26/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/12/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/12/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/16/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal