judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00409-CR
04-82-00409-CR
12/21/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Mendez, Rafael Soto
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/27/1982Mandate Issued
10/27/1982Mandate Issued
09/10/1982No Description Available.Dismissed
09/10/1982Motion to Withdraw DisposedDismissed
08/26/1982No Description Available.
08/26/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable David A. Berchelmann
81-CR-121
20 years