Case: 14-00-00780-CV
14-00-00780-CV
07/05/2000
Unknown Civil Case Type.
Petroleum Wholesale, Inc.
Shabana Enterprises, Inc. and Hussian, Varsha
No
7th Court of Appeals
07/11/2000
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
08/01/2000 | Record due | | |
07/24/2000 | Docketing statement DUE | | |
07/24/2000 | Mediation Docketing Statement DUE | | |
07/11/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
07/11/2000 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | GRANTED | |
07/07/2000 | Clerk's copy of NOA FILED | | |
07/07/2000 | Notice for Docketing Statement FILED | | |
07/05/2000 | Court fee due | | |
07/05/2000 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
07/03/2000 | Notice of Appeal FILED - APP | | |
04/20/2000 | Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law FILED | | |
04/03/2000 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/11/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
PETROLEUM WHOLESALE, INC. | Appellant | Stuart W. Lapp |
SHABANA ENTERPRISES, INC. AND | Appellee | George J. Prappas |
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
Honorable PATRICIA RAE LYKOS
97-44520