judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00345-CR
01-81-00345-CR
12/20/1981
No description available.
Vasquez, Michael
Texas, The State of
No
Thomson/West
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/18/1991Mandate received from CCA or Supreme Court
10/02/1991Motion for rehearing disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
11/05/1987Motion for rehearing filed
10/21/1987Higher court decisionAffirmed
04/11/1984No description available.Grant motion
12/09/1983No description available.
10/27/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/06/1983Submitted
07/29/1983Submission
06/29/1983Brief filed
06/14/1983Brief filed
06/02/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/25/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/24/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/15/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/27/1983Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
01/17/1983Motion to substitute attorney disposed
01/06/1983Submitted
12/13/1982Submission
09/14/1982Brief filed
09/10/1982Record filed
08/26/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/12/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
07/19/1982Brief filed
07/01/1982Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/10/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/20/1982Opinion issuedAbate case
04/29/1982Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
12/20/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/18/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
StateCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
299,665
Life