Case: 02-0276
02-0276
03/28/2002
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
JESUS SALAS AND MARIO OROZCO CASILLAS
EXXONMOBIL CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/08/2003 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | Petitioners Jesus Salas' and Mario Orozco Casillas' Reply brief | |
12/11/2002 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Exxon Mobil Corp.'s response brief on the merits | |
10/21/2002 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioner's brief on the merits | |
07/31/2002 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | On behalf of Jesus Salas and Mario Orozco Casillas reply to Exxon-Mobil Corporation's response | |
07/08/2002 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation | |
03/28/2002 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
03/28/2002 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Jesus Salas et al | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/2003 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order sent w/returned record to the court of appeals. | | |
05/27/2003 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | w/final order to the court of appeals. | | |
05/23/2003 | Case Stored | G02/24 F-3 | | |
04/03/2003 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | Justice O'Neill not sitting. | |
03/18/2003 | Notice received | from 14th COA Ed Wells, the supplemental clerk's record has been rec'd and filed | | |
01/08/2003 | Reply Brief | Petitioners Jesus Salas' and Mario Orozco Casillas' Reply brief | | |
12/11/2002 | Brief on the Merits | Exxon Mobil Corp.'s response brief on the merits | | |
12/06/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | see calendar for dates, (further requests for extensions of time will be disfa vored | |
12/06/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Respondent's 2nd m/e/t to file their brief on the merits | | |
12/06/2002 | Phone call from Clerk's Office | MET GRANTED AS REQUESTED TO 12/11 | | |
12/05/2002 | Call received | from Jeanne, forgot to inclose an add'l copy of rspndt's 2nd m/e/t to brief. Would like a file stmp copy returned to her in the Fed ex env. | | |
11/12/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | See calender for dates | |
11/12/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Respondent's m/e/t to file brief on the merits | | |
10/21/2002 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's brief on the merits | | |
10/15/2002 | Letter Filed | showing filing of motions in the 14th court of appeals | | |
09/23/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Pet/s brief due 10-21-02. Resp/s br due 11-12-02. Pet/s reply brief due 11-27-02. Briefs due n/l/t 5:00 pm. Mlbx rule d/n/a. | |
09/23/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Petitioner's m/e/t to file brief on the merits | | |
09/17/2002 | Record Received (See Remarks) | Inventory in remarks | | |
09/03/2002 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Pet/s brief on the merits is due 10-03-02, resp br is due 10-23-02, pet/s repl y br is due 11-07-02; all br/s due n/l/t 5:00 pm., mlbx rule d/n/a | | |
09/03/2002 | Record Requested in Petition for Review | Called and faxed the 14th CA - spoke to Renee Wilson | | |
07/31/2002 | Reply to Response | On behalf of Jesus Salas and Mario Orozco Casillas reply to Exxon-Mobil Corporation's response | | |
07/26/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Pet/s m/e/t to file reply to response was granted until July 31, 2002. Reply due n/l/t 5:00 pm. Mailbox rule d/n/a. | |
07/24/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time filed | Petitioners' m/e/t to file reply to Exxonmobil's response | | |
07/08/2002 | Response to Petition | On behalf of Exxon Mobil Corporation | | |
07/03/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Respondent's m/e/t to file response was granted until July 10, 2002. Response due n/l/t 5:00 pm. Mailbox rule d/n/a. | |
07/03/2002 | Response to petition, motion, etc. due | Response due n/l/t 5:00 pm July 10, 2002. Mailbox rule d/n/a. | | |
06/27/2002 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Respondent's m/e/t to file response | | |
05/28/2002 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Response is due n/l/t 5:00 pm., 06-27-02, mlbx rule d/n/a | | |
04/30/2002 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/28/2002 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
03/28/2002 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Jesus Salas et al | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/23/2003 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/24-F-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION | Respondent | Mr. Joe M. Roden Ms. JoAnn Lee Mr. Rusty Hardin Ms. Mary Beth Alford |
RODRIGUEZ, SANTIAGO LOPEZ | Petitioner | Mr. Steve Nelson |
ORTIZ, JESUS | Petitioner | Mr. Steve Nelson |
Salas, Jesus | Petitioner | Mr. Micheal Wayne Dobbs Mr. Earnest W. Wotring |
CASILLAS, MARIO OROZCO | Petitioner | Mr. William James Jackson |
GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey Jury |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-01-00972-CV
Dismissed WOJ
RULE 47.7, 12-20-01
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
80th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott R. Link
1999-29961