judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-82-00155-CR
05-82-00155-CR
12/18/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Virgil John Etchieson, III
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
12/16/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
07/26/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/25/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
02/08/1996Letter issued by the court
02/08/1996Order issued
01/26/1996Motion to withdraw record filed
07/19/1983Petition for discretionary review filed in Court of Criminal Appeals
07/11/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/10/1983Motion for rehearing filed
06/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/16/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/26/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
04/19/1982Reporters record filed
04/19/1982Clerks record filed
12/18/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/02/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Etchieson, III, Virgil JohnCriminal - Appellant
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 3
F81-11967-MJ
50 years