Case: 07-00-00327-CV
07-00-00327-CV
07/03/2000
Miscellaneous civil
John Lewis Nowak
Twelve Oaks Medical Center, Inc., d/b/a AMI Twelve Oaks Hospital, Fernando Azevedo, M.D. and Greater Houston Anesthesia Association
No
1st Court of Appeals
07/03/2000
01-00-00648-CV
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2001 | Mandate Issued | | |||
12/18/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||
12/18/2000 | Submitted | | |||
12/13/2000 | Response to any order, inquiry or motion | | |||
11/16/2000 | Response to any order, inquiry or motion | | |||
10/31/2000 | Extension of time for response | GRANT | | ||
10/30/2000 | Extension of time for response | | |||
10/17/2000 | Case reinstated | | |||
10/17/2000 | Involuntary Dismissal - CV | | |||
10/17/2000 | Motion to reinstate disposed | GRANT | | ||
09/26/2000 | Motion to Reinstate Filed | | |||
09/14/2000 | Clerk`s Record Received | | |||
09/13/2000 | Opinion issued | Dismissed-Want of Jurisdiction |
| ||
09/13/2000 | Submitted | | |||
08/30/2000 | Involuntary Dismissal - CV | | |||
08/04/2000 | Involuntary Dismissal - CV | | |||
07/27/2000 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed | GRANT | | ||
07/25/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
07/14/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
07/12/2000 | Motion to Substitute Counsel Filed | | |||
07/12/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
07/12/2000 | Docketing Statement Filed | | |||
07/03/2000 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | | |||
06/16/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/08/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Fernando Azevedo, M.D. and Greater Anesthesia Association | Appellee | |
Nowak, John Lewis | Appellant | Joe A. Izen Jr. |
Twelve Oaks Medical Center, Inc. d/b/a AMI Twelve Oaks Hospital | Appellee | Melanie L. Vincent |
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
Honorable Martha Hill Jamison
9857248