Case: 00-0669
00-0669
07/03/2000
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
JOHN WALTON CANNON
EUGENE STERN, MATTHEW STERN, and STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/28/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | On behalf of John Walton Cannon | |
07/03/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | attached to petition | |
07/03/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | on behalf of John Walton Cannon | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Case Stored | 19-A-1 | | |
01/08/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
09/28/2000 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
09/05/2000 | Description of document returned to Supreme Court | to Ms. Trina McReynolds - no known forwarding address. | | |
08/28/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | On behalf of John Walton Cannon | | |
08/28/2000 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | Record remains in clerk's office | | |
08/10/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
07/11/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
07/03/2000 | Appendix Filed | attached to petition | | |
07/03/2000 | Petition for Review | on behalf of John Walton Cannon | | |
07/03/2000 | Response Waiver filed | Eugene Stren, et al. response waiver | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/18/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location 19-A-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CANNON, JOHN WALTON | Petitioner | Mr. John Walton Cannon |
STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTO INSURAN | Respondent | Ms. Trina McReynolds Bailey |
STERN, MATTHEW | Respondent | Mr. Michael M. McReynolds |
STERN, EUGENE | Respondent | Mr. Michael M. McReynolds |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-97-02208-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 04-04-00
5th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Dallas
Honorable Fred S. Harless
CC-96-02279-B