Case: 00-0683
00-0683
07/06/2000
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
PORTIA J. BOTT d/b/a LAW OFFICE OF PORTIA J. BOTT
JACKSON & RHODES
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/29/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | ON BEHALF OF PORTIA J. BOTT d/b/a LAW OFFICE OF PORTIA J. BOTT | |
08/07/2000 | Response to Petition | Respondent | on behalf of Jackson & Rhodes, P. C. | |
07/06/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
07/06/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Portia J. Bott | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/22/2001 | Case Stored | G02/19-G-1 | | |
01/30/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
11/02/2000 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | | |
09/29/2000 | Motion for Rehearing | ON BEHALF OF PORTIA J. BOTT d/b/a LAW OFFICE OF PORTIA J. BOTT | | |
09/29/2000 | Motion for Rehearing forwarded | RECORD REMAINS IN THE CLERK'S OFFICE | | |
09/14/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/08/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/07/2000 | Response to Petition | on behalf of Jackson & Rhodes, P. C. | | |
07/20/2000 | Notice of Appearance | Robert R. Cole, Jr. and Douglas W. Brady make their notice of appearance for Jackson & Rhodes | | |
07/06/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
07/06/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Portia J. Bott | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
02/22/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/19-G-1. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
LAW OFFICE OF PORTIA J. BOTT | Petitioner | Mr. Michael S. Quinn |
BOTT, PORTIA J. | Petitioner | Mr. Michael S. Quinn |
JACKSON & RHODES | Respondent | Ms. Susan Minton Poore Mr. Robert R. Cole Jr. Mr. Douglas W. Brady |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-99-01047-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 05-22-00
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable MICHAEL J. O'NEILL
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 5
Dallas
Honorable Charles Stokes
CC-98-5694-E