Case: 00-0678
00-0678
07/06/2000
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
NANCY WILSON
DR.KEN KORTHAUER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
08/03/2000 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of Nancy Wilson | |
07/06/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | Appendix attached | |
07/06/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Nancy Wilson | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/17/2000 | Case Stored | 40-E-4 | | |
11/17/2000 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
09/07/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
08/08/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
08/03/2000 | Response to Petition | On behalf of Nancy Wilson | | |
07/06/2000 | Appendix Filed | Appendix attached | | |
07/06/2000 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Nancy Wilson | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
11/17/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 40-E-4 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
KORTHAUER, KEN | Respondent | Mr. John R. Strawn Jr. |
WILSON, NANCY | Petitioner | Mr. Sam M. Yates Mr. Otto D. Hewitt III |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-99-00051-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
21 SW3d 573, 05-18-00
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable KEM THOMPSON FROST
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Kathleen S. Stone
97-09026