judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SHAW, JAMES R. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-0733
Short Caption:SHAW, JAMES R. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2528-80Filed Date:06/13/1983

Opening Event Date:06/13/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/08/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/23/1984
Argued/Submitted:12/11/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Martin S. Echter YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Kenneth J. Melilli YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SHAW, JAMES R. UNITED STATES
06/13/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/08/1984FiledRecord Completed
10/23/1984FiledBriefing Completed
12/11/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition