judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00004-CV
05-82-00004-CV
12/21/1981
Contract
Morris, Don, T/A Don Morris Construction Co.
Roach Pain Co., Inc. T/A W. J. Hancock Co.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/26/2018Order enteredDestroy
08/09/2018Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
06/13/2018Letter issued by the court
09/17/1984Mandate Issued
01/03/1983Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1982Response to Motion
12/09/1982Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
11/09/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
11/09/1982Opinion issuedReversed & Rendered
10/27/1982Submitted
06/14/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/01/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/29/1982Brief Filed
04/02/1982Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.
03/22/1982Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/10/1982Supplemental Transcript filed
01/05/1982Exhibits Filed
01/05/1982Statement of Facts Filed
01/04/1982Transcript Filed
12/21/1981Appeal Bond Filed
12/21/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/26/2018Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Dallas
cc-79-6314-d