judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01312-CR
05-81-01312-CR
12/16/1981
Murder
Gregory Lynn Hawkins
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/12/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
12/21/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
08/07/1985Letter issued by the court
11/22/1983Letter received
10/13/1983Letter issued by the court
10/13/1983Letter received
04/06/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/18/1983Letter issued by the court
01/10/1983Letter received
10/08/1982Clerks record filed
09/10/1982Letter filed
09/10/1982Letter issued by the court
02/12/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/20/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/19/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
01/08/1982Reporters record filed
12/21/1981Brief filed - oral argument not requested
12/16/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/06/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Hawkins, Gregory LynnCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
15th Judicial District Court
Grayson
Honorable Grayson County Judge, 15th District Court
32142
99 years