Case Information: 35326 | |||
Short Caption: | WHEELER VS. DE LA SIERRA | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A396072 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 02/08/2000 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/20/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Vincent W. Wheeler--check no. 276. | ||
12/20/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 99-12945 | |
01/11/2000 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Request to Proceed in Pro Per. | 00-00438 | |
01/11/2000 | Other Incoming Document | Received Proper Person Document. Emergency Request for Assistance of the Supreme Court in aid of its Appellate Jurisdiction. | 00-00440 | |
01/12/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 00-00492 | |
01/13/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Order Granting Temporary Stay and Requesting Response. The real property is scheduled to be sold at a private sale on or after January 17, 2000. On January 11, 2000, appellant submitted a proper person emergency motion for a stay of the district court's order. fn1[Appellant has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person. On January 11, 2000, appellant submitted a request to proceed in this matter in proper person along with his emergency motion for a stay. We grant appellant's request to proceed in proper person only with respect to the motion for a stay. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's proper person documents received on January 11, 2000]. Respondent shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve and opposition to appellant's motion for a stay. We temporarily stay the district court's order in Case Number A396072 authorizing the sale of the real property that is the subject of the partition action below. | 00-00577 | |
01/13/2000 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Request to Proceed in Pro Per. | 00-00438 | |
01/13/2000 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Emergency Request for Assistance of the Supreme Court in aid of its Appellate Jurisdiction. | 00-00440 | |
01/25/2000 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Application for Stay. | 00-01211 | |
02/08/2000 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. Mailed on 02/02/00. | 00-01981 | |
02/08/2000 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/11/2000 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Affidavit. Supplemental Affidavit of Ashley E. Nitz, Esq. To Opposition to Application for Stay filed January 25, 2000. | 00-02191 | |
02/18/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. " . . . we dismiss this appeal, and we vacate our temporary stay of the district court's order." fn1[Although appellant has not been granted permission to file these documents in proper perosn, we have received and considered these documents.We conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB | 00-02582 | |
03/15/2000 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. | 00-04071 | |
03/15/2000 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/27/2000 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 22, 2000. | 00-04071 |