Case: PD-1006-90
PD-1006-90
09/27/1990
PDR Case Type
MATHEWS, REGINALD GENE
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/14/1990 | FINAL DISP | Refused | |
11/28/1990 | PDR DISP | Refused | |
10/30/1990 | NO RESPONSE FILED | | |
09/27/1990 | PDR FILED | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/07/1991 | STORED | RETURNED COA |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
STATE OF TEXAS | State | John Holmes |
MATHEWS, REGINALD GENE | Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases) | Janet Seymour Morrow |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-90-00096-CR
AFF 7-19-90
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
228th District Court
Harris
Honorable TED POE
542057