Case: D-0318
D-0318
09/19/1990
App Writ of Error
BETTY LOU MURPHY
ANA MURPHY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
10/03/1990 | Reply to Response | Respondent | | |
09/19/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
09/05/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
12/28/1990 | Record returned to Court of Appeals | NO Rehearing Filed | | |
11/28/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Disposed | Denied | AS AMENDED | |
10/11/1990 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/11/1990 | No description available. | | | |
10/03/1990 | Reply to Response | | | |
09/24/1990 | Amendment to application for writ of error | Amended cover page to Petitioner's App. | | |
09/19/1990 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
12/28/1990 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
MURPHY, ANA | Respondent | Mr. Phelps Jr. |
MURPHY, BETTY LOU | Petitioner | Mr. Harry Skeins Jr. |
Court of Appeals Information:
04-89-00628-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 07-18-90
4th Court of Appeals
Honorable DAVID PEEPLES
Trial Court Information
37th District Court
Bexar
Honorable Jay Patterson
84-CI-06752