judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHNSON, WILBUR EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP.

Case Information: 85-CV-0697
Short Caption:JOHNSON, WILBUR EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP.Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA867-83Filed Date:05/23/1985

Opening Event Date:05/23/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/10/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/31/1985
Argued/Submitted:05/08/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Howard L. Nelson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
James W. Greene YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Sidney M. Bresler NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901JOHNSON, WILBUR EDGEWOOD MANAGEMENT CORP.
05/23/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
09/10/1985FiledRecord Completed
12/31/1985FiledBriefing Completed
05/08/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/10/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition