judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCGEE (FOREST) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34676
Short Caption:MCGEE (FOREST) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 51807
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR97P1527Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/17/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07682
08/23/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. July 1, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Isolde Zihn. 99-07857
08/27/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-08031
08/27/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-08032
09/09/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-08505
10/25/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
12/03/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 99-12093
12/29/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-13315
12/29/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/10/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 4, 2000. 99-13315