judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

WELLS, MICHAEL EMMETT PFB

Case Information: 81-AA-0795
Short Caption:WELLS, MICHAEL EMMETT PFBClassification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Police/Fire Retire/Relief Bd.
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/06/1981

Opening Event Date:07/06/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:07/17/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/18/1982
Argued/Submitted:05/20/1982
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-PetitionerJohn Doe N
Robert E. DesoNY
Amicus-PetitionerJohn Doe N
Robert E. Greenberg NN
PetitionerJohn Doe N
RespondentJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN
RespondentJohn Doe N
Diana M. Savit NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901WELLS, MICHAEL EMMETT PFB
07/06/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
07/17/1981FiledRecord Completed
03/18/1982FiledBriefing Completed
05/20/1982FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/06/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition