judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THOMAS MERCHANT v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, et al.

Case Heading (06-278)
Case Number:06-278Case Docketed On:12/05/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:THOMAS MERCHANT v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, et al.
Full Title:THOMAS MERCHANT, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STATE OF WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, and STATE OF WYOMING, BOARD OF PAROLE, and their responsible employees, in their official capacities, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantThomas MerchantRobert T. Moxley
AppelleeDepartment of CorrectionsPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
David L. Delicath
Daniel Michael Fetsco
AppelleeBoard of Parole

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 159
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/05/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/05/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
12/05/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/05/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/22/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/23/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/02/2007Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/19/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
03/29/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
04/05/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/05/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/11/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
04/16/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, five volumes. Volumes I-IV, original papers; volume V, transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/10/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal orderOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/26/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/26/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/30/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/29/07 by Rosemary Montez.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal