judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY v. J. R. MCCOMBS

Case: A-211
A-211
06/02/1944
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS AND NEW ORLEANS RAILROAD COMPANY
J. R. MCCOMBS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/05/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/07/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/16/1944Bond
09/27/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/05/1944Response to Petition
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas and New Orleans Railroad CompanyPetitioner
J. R. McCombsRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information