judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DIXON, MAURICE T. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-0935
Short Caption:DIXON, MAURICE T. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/25/1983

Opening Event Date:07/25/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:05/02/1984Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/02/1984
Argued/Submitted:10/04/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Joseph H. Green, Jr.YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Daniel S. Seikaly YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901DIXON, MAURICE T. UNITED STATES
07/25/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
05/02/1984FiledRecord Completed
07/02/1984FiledBriefing Completed
10/04/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/11/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition