Case Information: 38891 | |||
Short Caption: | NAPOLITANO (RICHARD) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C177080 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/11/2001 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/11/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 01-20740 | |
12/11/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/12/2001 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 8/6/01; 10/8/01; 11/5/01 and 11/14/01. Court Reporters: Joe D'Amato and Maureen Schorn. Filed in district court on: December 6, 2001. | 01-20864 | |
12/17/2001 | Transcript | Filed Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 10/8/01, 11/5/01, 11/14/01. Court Reporter: Maureen Schorn. | 01-21164 | |
12/18/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. Copy filed in district court on: 12/6/01. | 01-21292 | |
01/14/2002 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 02-00900 | |
01/31/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. filed January 14, 2002, for an extension of time to file the fast track statement. The requested rough draft transcripts are overdue. Court reporter or recorder Joe D'Amato shall file the requested transcripts within 10 days of this order or show cause why he should not be sanctioned. The fast track statement and appendix shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order. | 02-02037 | |
02/14/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 02-02920 | |
02/14/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 02-02921 | |
03/06/2002 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 02-04081 | |
03/06/2002 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 02-04082 | |
03/28/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP01-CY/DA/ML | 02-05539 | |
04/23/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-05742 | |
04/23/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
04/29/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 26, 2002. | 02-05742 |