judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

CITY OF BEAUMONT v. CALDER PLACE CORPORATION

Case: A-212
A-212
06/02/1944
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF BEAUMONT
CALDER PLACE CORPORATION
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/07/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/26/1953Letter Filed
04/12/1945Letter Filed
12/07/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/02/1944Miscellaneous Motion
06/21/1944Document received (See Remarks)
06/13/1944Additional Copies receivedFiling granted
06/02/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/02/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CITY OF BEAUMONTPetitioner
Calder Place CorporationRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information