judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LEWIS, SAUL F. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN

Case Information: 80-CV-1330
Short Caption:LEWIS, SAUL F. WASHINGTON METROPOLITANClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:4952-79Filed Date:11/14/1980

Opening Event Date:11/14/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/18/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/08/1982
Argued/Submitted:02/09/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Laurence T. Scott YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LEWIS, SAUL F. ET AL. WASHINGTON METROPOLITAN AREA TRANSIT AUTHORITY ET AL
11/14/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/18/1981FiledRecord Completed
11/08/1982FiledBriefing Completed
02/09/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/29/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition