judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT H. HICKS and PRONGHORN PUBLISHING, INC. a Wyoming Corporation, individually and ex rel., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SCENIC PRESERVE TRUST v. FRED L. DOWD and LINDA S. DOWD; and the BOARD OF JOHNSON COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

Case Heading (06-2)
Case Number:06-2Case Docketed On:01/04/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Johnson CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - City, County, State and Local Powers (Title 16)
Short Title:ROBERT H. HICKS and PRONGHORN PUBLISHING, INC. a Wyoming Corporation, individually and ex rel., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SCENIC PRESERVE TRUST v. FRED L. DOWD and LINDA S. DOWD; and the BOARD OF JOHNSON COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Full Title:ROBERT H. HICKS and PRONGHORN PUBLISHING, INC. a Wyoming Corporation, individually and ex rel., BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE SCENIC PRESERVE TRUST, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. FRED L. DOWD and LINDA S. DOWD; and the BOARD OF JOHNSON COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Appelles (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert H. HicksDennis M. Kirven
AppellantPronghorn Publishing, Inc.Dennis M. Kirven
AppellantBoard of Trustees of the Scenic Preserve TrustDennis M. Kirven
AppelleeFred L. DowdTom C. Toner
AppelleeLinda S. DowdTom C. Toner
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Johnson County, WyomingGreg L. Goddard

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:2007 WY 74
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/04/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/04/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/04/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/04/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/17/2006Brief - Appellants; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record.BriefAppellantFinal
03/31/2006Brief - Appellees Dowd; and received copy of brief on disk.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/04/2006Brief - Appellees Board of Johnson County Commissioners.BriefAppelleeFinal
04/14/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/17/2006Brief - Appellants replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/17/2006Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/24/2006Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
04/24/2006Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
04/26/2006Record - Transmitted record on appealRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/16/2006Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/23/2006Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Dennis M. Kirven for appellants; Tom C. Toner and Greg L. Goddard for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/23/2006Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/09/2007Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/25/2007Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/25/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/25/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/31/2007Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal