judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATEN (SOLOMON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34677
Short Caption:STATEN (SOLOMON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C149648Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/08/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/18/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/18/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-07686
08/23/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Submission of Case Appeal Statement to the Nevada Supreme Court. (with copy of case appeal statement filed in district court on August 17, 1999) 99-07876
09/15/1999Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement due on or before: September 20, 1999. 99-08688
09/21/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time to Order Transcripts and File Fast Track Statement 99-08985
09/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Extending Time. The fast track statement shall be filed and served within 30 days of this order.
04/05/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-05487
05/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Buckley has failed to respond to this court's order of April 5, 2000. We conclude that the imposition of a monetary sanction is appropriate. Buckley shall personally pay the sum of $100.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment within 20 days of the date of this order and shall file and serve the fast track statement within 10 days of this order or show cause why Buckley should not be sanctioned further. 00-08263
07/25/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Sanctions. Buckley has again failed to respond to our order. Further, she has not paid the previous sanction, nor has she filed a fast track statement. We conclude that Buckley's failure to comply with this court's orders and NRAP 3C warrants additional sanctions in the sum of $250.00. Buckley shall personally pay the sum of $250.00 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide the clerk of this court with proof of said payment within 15 days of the date of this order. fn1[We note that the $100.00 Buckley was previously sanctioned is still unpaid and due.] Buckley shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why she should not be sanctioned further. 00-12876
09/05/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw and Motion to Reconsider Sanction. 00-15624
10/03/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. We vacate those portions of our orders of May 17, 2000 and July 25, 2000, imposing santions in the sums of $100.00 and $250.00 respectively, on attorney Joan Buckley. Because counsel for appellant had closed her law office, the motion to withdraw as counsel is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court clerk: 5 days to transmit district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellant's counsel. Counsel: 10 days to enter appearance. fn1[All filing deadlines shall run from the date on which counsel enters an appearance with this court.] 00-17442
10/30/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Compliance with Order of October 3, 2000. Valarie Fujii appointed to represent appellant. 00-19043
11/03/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of Notice of Appointment of Counsel filed in district court on October 31, 2000, appointing Valarie I. Fujii as counsel for appellant. 00-19316
11/09/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Valarie I. Fujii (with attached copy of Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on 11/7/00). 00-19703
12/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-21775
12/13/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. STRICKEN BY ORDER 01/05/01. 00-21776
12/21/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw the Motion for Extension of Time to file Opening Brief of Appellant Soloman Staten. 00-22271
01/02/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 4/26/99 (2); 4/27/99; 4/28/99. Court Reporter: James Helleso. 01-00034
01/04/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Court Reporter James Helleso. The transcripts mailed last week indicated the wrong district court case number. 01-00201
01/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 13, 2000, counsel for appellant filed two separate motions for extensions of time. On December 21, 2000, counsel for appellant filed a motion to withdraw one of the motions for an extension. The motion is granted. The clerk of this court shall strike the "Motion to Extend Time to file the Opening Brief" filed on December 13, 2000. The motion for an extension of time to file the fast track statement is granted. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 40 days of the date of this order. 01-00298
01/08/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Mailing Re: Motion for Extension of time to file Fast Track Statement for Appellant soloman Staten. 01-00368
02/21/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-03297
03/09/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Fast Track Statement for Appellant Soloman Staten. 01-04298
03/26/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. On March 9, 2001, counsel for appellant filed a motion for an extension of time to file an amended fast track statement. fn1[Appellant's motion is denied as moot.] We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP 9 for counsel to file a certified transcript. If a party's brief will cite to documents not previously filed in this court, that party shall file and serve an appropriately documented supplemental appendix with the brief.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 01-05216
05/09/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 05/07/01. 01-07745
05/09/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Vols. 1 through 3. 01-07746
06/12/2001MotionFiled Motion and Order Extending Time. Brief due: June 25, 2001. 01-09795
06/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Second Request). 01-10821
06/27/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed June 27, 2001. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before July 9, 2001. 01-10867
07/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (Third Request). 01-11608
07/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed July 10, 2001. Respondent shall have to and including July 18, 2001, to file and serve the answering brief. 01-11677
07/20/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 01-12347
08/17/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 08/15/01. 01-14013
10/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 01-16828
10/08/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 02-14344
09/17/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-14814
09/17/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/27/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 19, 2002. 02-14814