judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-81-00348-CR
02-81-00348-CR
11/25/1981
Burglary
Stanfield, Paul
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1986Mandate Issued
11/07/1986Mandate Issued
10/22/1986Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals Reversed & Judg Trial Ct Affirmd
07/09/1986Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/07/1986Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals Reversed & Judg Trial Ct Affirmd
10/27/1982Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1982Petition for Discretionary Review Filed in CCA
08/11/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
07/26/1982Response Filed
07/14/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
06/30/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/23/1982Submitted
06/23/1982Submission
03/12/1982Submission
02/23/1982Brief Filed
01/26/1982Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/30/1981Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/01/1981No Description Available.
11/30/1981Brief Filed
11/25/1981Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
11/25/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/10/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
235th District Court
Cooke
Honorable Ralph H. Walton,
7960
7 years