Case Information: 85-CV-0836 | |||
Short Caption: | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE SIMMS, VIRGIL A. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 85-CV-0836 | Consolidated: | 85-CV-0837 , 85-CV-0838 , 85-CV-0839 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | MPA9-84 | Filed Date: | 06/21/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/21/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/20/1985 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/01/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 07/10/1986 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA OFFICE OF PERSONNEL SIMMS, VIRGIL A. | |||
01/01/1906 | COHENS SIMMS, BODRICK, McKENZIE ET AL DOBROVIRW for: EARL A. BURROWS, JR. | |||
06/21/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
11/20/1985 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
05/01/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
07/10/1986 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
01/30/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |