judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

THOMAS, OTIS L. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 83-CM-0983
Short Caption:THOMAS, OTIS L. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Other Misdemeanor
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:07/26/1983

Opening Event Date:07/26/1983Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:11/03/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/26/1984
Argued/Submitted:06/27/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Shelley L. Kreitman YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Robert L. BredhoffYN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901THOMAS, OTIS L. UNITED STATES
07/26/1983FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
11/03/1983FiledRecord Completed
03/26/1984FiledBriefing Completed
06/27/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
07/13/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition