judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 08-81-00284-CR
08-81-00284-CR
11/30/1981
Theft
Swindle, David
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
04/07/1983Mandate Issued
01/19/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/06/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
04/14/1982Brief Filed
04/14/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/01/1982Brief Filed
02/03/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/20/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
11/30/1981Record filed.
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/07/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - AppellantHon. Michael R. Gibson
UnknownCriminal - State of TexasHon. Steve W. Simmons
Trial Court Information
171st District Court
El Paso
35246-171
5 yrs. + $5000. fine