judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 10-81-00190-CR
10-81-00190-CR
11/25/1981
Murder
Jim Lott
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/03/2008Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/18/1983Case stored
04/18/1983Mandate issued by this Court
12/02/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/22/1982Submitted
11/25/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/2008Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
232nd District Court
Harris
263,897
20 Years