judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-81-00449-CR
04-81-00449-CR
11/30/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Bautista, Jr., Celestino
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/17/1984Mandate Issued
01/17/1984Case Returned from Higher Court
01/17/1984Mandate Issued
11/23/1983Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
08/17/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/15/1983Petition for Review Filed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/29/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1982Submission
10/13/1982Submission
10/13/1982Submitted
11/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/19/1981Record Approved
09/17/1981Case ready to be set
09/17/1981Brief Filed
09/17/1981Case ready to be set
07/03/1981Brief Filed
02/02/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
12/29/1980Record Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
218th Judicial District Court
Atascosa
Honorable Robert L. Eschenburg, II
6764
15 years