judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JONES VS. WILLIAMS

Case Information: 35386
Short Caption:JONES VS. WILLIAMSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D167496Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/28/1999Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Returned, with letter, check no. 2893 in the amount of $100 to Dean R. Patti.
12/28/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. (SEALED) Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-13262
12/28/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. The district court clerk recently made this court aware of the existence of this appeal and transmitted to the clerk of this court an abbreviated record. Cause appearing, the clerk of this court shall docket the appeal and file the abbreviated record. Nevertheless, appellant having failed to take any steps in furtherance of the prosecution of this appeal, we hereby dismiss this appeal as abandoned. [2] The clerk of this court shall return to appellant's counsel the filing fee transmitted with the abbreviated record. SNP99B 99-13263
01/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01197
01/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 1, 2000. 00-01197
02/10/2000Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from attorney Douglas Crawford. He does not represent respondent in this matter. He withdrew in district court on April 16, 1996. 00-02110